$307,500
- Buyer Mayra Vela and Juan M. Flores
- Seller Glenn Byrne
$172,500
- Buyer Katherine Byrne
- Seller Angela A. Ignasiak (deceased) and Nason Linda McElherne (executor)
Jul. 8, 2024 $700,000
Jul. 17, 2024 $635,000
Jul. 1, 2024 $600,000
Apr. 15, 2024 $585,000
Jan. 2, 2024 $585,000
Nov. 3, 2023 $565,000
Jul. 11, 2024 $556,000
Jul. 8, 2024 $552,000
Jul. 8, 2024 $550,000
Jul. 29, 2024 $550,000
Current Owners
Mayra Vela and Juan M. Flores
Purchase Price
$307,500 (2022)
Assessed Value
N/A (2023)
Property Taxes
$8,354 (2023)
Lot Size
6,600 Sqft (0.15 acres)
Tax $/Acre
$55,691 /Acre
Home Size
1,439 Sqft
Beds
N/A
Baths
1
Built
N/A
$307,500
$172,500
U.S. House of Representatives:
State Senator:
State Representative:
Middle School:
High School: